IA SF385 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1087.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1087.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the revised uniform athlete agents Act and providing remedies and penalties. (Formerly SSB 1096.) Effective 7-1-18.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the revised uniform athlete agents Act and providing remedies and penalties. (Formerly SSB 1096.) Effective 7-1-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1087. |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1086. |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Secretary's report on correction in enrollment. S.J. 1090. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 987. |
2018-04-25 | House | Messaged to Senate H.J. 837. |
2018-04-25 | House | Passed House, ayes 94, nays 1. H.J. 827. |
2018-03-22 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 671. |
2018-03-15 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 596. |
2018-03-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-03-07 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: McKean, Meyer and Rizer. H.J. 515. |
2017-03-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2017-03-22 | House | Subcommittee: McKean, Carlin and Meyer. H.J. 756. |
2017-03-07 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 519. |
2017-03-06 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 514. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 488. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays 0. S.J. 487. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 434. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 432. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1096 (Related) 2017-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage.