IA SF385 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-23 - Subcommittee, Fry, Dawson, and Klein. H.J. 106.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-23 - Subcommittee, Fry, Dawson, and Klein. H.J. 106.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act modifying the imposition of certain special sentences. (Formerly SSB 1230.)
Title
A bill for an act modifying the imposition of certain special sentences. (Formerly SSB 1230.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-23 | House | Subcommittee, Fry, Dawson, and Klein. H.J. 106. |
2013-12-31 | House | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 1110. |
2013-04-12 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 836. |
2013-03-28 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 706. |
2013-03-27 | House | Subcommittee reassigned, Fry, Dawson, and Klein. H.J. 698. |
2013-03-20 | House | Subcommittee, Fry, Brandenburg, and Dawson. H.J. 654. |
2013-03-19 | House | Read first time, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 619. |
2013-03-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 616. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 591. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 39, nays 11. S.J. 590. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Amendment S-3048 filed, adopted. S.J. 590. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Amendment S-3036 withdrawn. S.J. 589. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Amendment S-3036 filed. S.J. 581. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 445. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 436. |