IA SF383 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 929.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 929.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the sealing of juvenile delinquency records. (Formerly SSB 1215.) Effective 7-1-14.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the sealing of juvenile delinquency records. (Formerly SSB 1215.) Effective 7-1-14.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 929. |
2014-05-02 | House | Sent to Governor. S.J. 929. |
2014-05-02 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 929. |
2014-04-29 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 836. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 880. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 880. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5191. S.J. 879. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5191. S.J. 877. |
2014-04-28 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 831. |
2014-04-28 | House | Passed House, ayes 95, nays none. H.J. 828. |
2014-04-28 | House | Committee amendment H-8027 adopted. H.J. 828. |
2014-03-21 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 560. |
2014-02-25 | House | Committee amendment H-8027 filed. H.J. 338. |
2014-02-25 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 338. |
2014-02-11 | House | Subcommittee reassigned, Kaufmann, Baltimore, and Dawson. H.J. 219. |
2013-12-31 | House | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-03-25 | House | Subcommittee, Hess, Anderson, and Heartsill. H.J. 671. |
2013-03-19 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 619. |
2013-03-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 594. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 567. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 564. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 444. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 436. |