IA SF376 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 761.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 761.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to disclosure of asbestos bankruptcy trust claims in civil asbestos actions, asbestos and silica claims prioritization, and successor corporation asbestos-related liability, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1095.) Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to disclosure of asbestos bankruptcy trust claims in civil asbestos actions, asbestos and silica claims prioritization, and successor corporation asbestos-related liability, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1095.) Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - House - Passed House (Y: 56 N: 39 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 56 N: 39 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 56 N: 39 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 761. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 721. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 721. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 584. |
2017-03-13 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 624. |
2017-03-22 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 755. |
2017-03-13 | House | Passed House, ayes 56, nays 39. H.J. 618. |
2017-03-13 | House | Substituted for HF 476. H.J. 618. |
2017-03-10 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 608. |
2017-03-09 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 569. |
2017-03-08 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 553. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 528. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 561. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 27, nays 22. S.J. 527. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3099 filed, lost. S.J. 526. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3098 adopted. S.J. 526. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3100 filed, lost. S.J. 526. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3098 filed. S.J. 525. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 428. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 423. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1095 (Related) 2017-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB104 (Related) 2017-02-22 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 454.
HF476 (Similar To) 2017-03-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 623.
HSB104 (Related) 2017-02-22 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 454.
HF476 (Similar To) 2017-03-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 623.