IA SF376 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - Subcommittee, Mathis, Chapman, and Wilhelm. S.J. 214.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - Subcommittee, Mathis, Chapman, and Wilhelm. S.J. 214.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for immunity from civil liability for registered architects and professional engineers providing disaster emergency assistance under specified circumstances. (See SF 2255.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for immunity from civil liability for registered architects and professional engineers providing disaster emergency assistance under specified circumstances. (See SF 2255.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee, Mathis, Chapman, and Wilhelm. S.J. 214. |
2013-12-31 | Senate | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Referred to Commerce. S.J. 1063. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 733. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 441. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 435. |