IA SF373 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to service in the national guard and reserve components of the armed forces, including applicability of reemployment protections, and military justice jurisdiction and statutes of limitation. (Formerly SSB 1077.) Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to service in the national guard and reserve components of the armed forces, including applicability of reemployment protections, and military justice jurisdiction and statutes of limitation. (Formerly SSB 1077.) Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1021. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 972. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 972. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 860. |
2017-04-04 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 863. |
2017-04-04 | House | Passed House, ayes 98, nays 0. H.J. 854. |
2017-04-04 | House | Substituted for HF 583. H.J. 853. |
2017-03-13 | House | Passed on file. H.J. 625. |
2017-03-09 | House | Read first time, referred to Veterans Affairs. H.J. 603. |
2017-03-08 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 562. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 536. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 561. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 529. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 429. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 422. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1077 (Related) 2017-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB157 (Related) 2017-03-01 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 495.
HF583 (Similar To) 2017-04-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 863.
HSB157 (Related) 2017-03-01 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 495.
HF583 (Similar To) 2017-04-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 863.