IA SF372 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Reported out of committee as SF 547. S.J. 506.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to education savings grants for pupils attending a nonpublic school or receiving competent private instruction, establishing an education savings grant fund, providing an income tax exemption, making appropriations, providing penalties, and including applicability provisions. (See SF 547.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to education savings grants for pupils attending a nonpublic school or receiving competent private instruction, establishing an education savings grant fund, providing an income tax exemption, making appropriations, providing penalties, and including applicability provisions. (See SF 547.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateReported out of committee as SF 547. S.J. 506.
2019-02-26SenateSubcommittee: Behn, Celsi, and Zaun. S.J. 407.
2019-02-25SenateIntroduced, referred to Education. S.J. 387.

Same As/Similar To

SF547 (Similar To) 2019-03-21 - Fiscal note.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback