IA SF369 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Subcommittee, Baltimore, Alons, and Meyer. H.J. 144.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Subcommittee, Baltimore, Alons, and Meyer. H.J. 144.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to marital agreements, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1196.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to marital agreements, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1196.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | House | Subcommittee, Baltimore, Alons, and Meyer. H.J. 144. |
2013-12-31 | House | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-04-12 | House | Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 836. |
2013-03-19 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 618. |
2013-03-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 597. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 585. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 583. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 418. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 415. |