IA SF367 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for charitable food donations to food banks and similar organizations, including by providing for appropriations and a tax credit, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1177; see SFs SF 4377 and 439.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for charitable food donations to food banks and similar organizations, including by providing for appropriations and a tax credit, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1177; see SFs SF 4377 and 439.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | Senate | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Subcommittee, Petersen, Behn, and McCoy. S.J. 554. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 505. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 419. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 414. |