IA SF366 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-15 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1037.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-15 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1037.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the reexamination and recalculation of disability retirement benefits for beneficiaries under the public safety peace officers' retirement, accident, and disability system. (Formerly SSB 1213.) Effective 7-1-15.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the reexamination and recalculation of disability retirement benefits for beneficiaries under the public safety peace officers' retirement, accident, and disability system. (Formerly SSB 1213.) Effective 7-1-15.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1037. |
2015-05-12 | House | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1019. |
2015-05-12 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1019. |
2015-04-27 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 922. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 930. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 928. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3132. S.J. 927. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3132. S.J. 910. |
2015-04-21 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 894. |
2015-04-30 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 969. |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed House, ayes 95, nays none. H.J. 880. |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee amendment H-1180 adopted. H.J. 879. |
2015-04-21 | House | Amendment H-1240 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 879. |
2015-04-09 | House | Fiscal note, as amended. HCS. |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 814. |
2015-04-06 | House | Committee amendment H-1180 filed. H.J. 757. |
2015-04-06 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 757. |
2015-03-31 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2015-03-30 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2015-03-23 | House | Subcommittee, Pettengill, Mascher, and Watts. H.J. 667. |
2015-03-23 | House | Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 666. |
2015-03-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 665. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 662. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays none. S.J. 658. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Amendment S-3051 adopted. S.J. 657. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3051 filed. S.J. 631. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 431. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 426. |