IA SF359 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1059.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act prohibiting and requiring certain actions relating to a fetus and providing penalties. (Formerly SF 52.) Effective 7-1-18.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act prohibiting and requiring certain actions relating to a fetus and providing penalties. (Formerly SF 52.) Effective 7-1-18.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04HouseSigned by Governor. S.J. 1059.
2018-05-02HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1038.
2018-05-02HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 906.
2018-05-01SenateImmediate message. S.J. 1013.
2018-05-01SenatePassed Senate, ayes 29, nays 17. S.J. 1013.
2018-05-01SenateSenate concurred with S-5288. S.J. 1012.
2018-05-01SenateMessage from House, with amendment S-5288. S.J. 1012.
2018-05-01HouseImmediate message. H.J. 901.
2018-05-01HouseObjection to title, objection withdrawn. H.J. 901.
2018-05-01HousePassed House, ayes 51, nays 46. H.J. 901.
2018-05-01HouseCommittee amendment H-8269 adopted, as amended. H.J. 900.
2018-05-01HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point not well taken. H.J. 900.
2018-05-01HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, Speaker resolved the point of order. H.J. 900.
2018-05-01HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, Speaker resolved the point of order. H.J. 900.
2018-05-01HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 899.
2018-05-01HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, Speaker resolved the point of order. H.J. 899.
2018-05-01HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, Speaker resolved the point of order. H.J. 899.
2018-05-01HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point not well taken. H.J. 899.
2018-05-01HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 899.
2018-05-01HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 899.
2018-05-01HouseAmendment H-8446 filed, ruled out of order H.J. 899.
2018-05-01HouseAmendments H-8295, H-8300, H-8313, H-8362 and H-8436 out of order. H.J. 898.
2018-05-01HouseAmendment H-8441 to committee amendment H-8269 adopted. H.J. 898.
2018-05-01HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, Speaker resolved point of order H.J. 897.
2018-05-01HouseMotion to suspend rules prevailed. H.J. 897.
2018-05-01HouseMotion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of H-8441 to committee amendment H-8269. H.J. 896.
2018-05-01HousePoint of order raised on H-8441 to committee amendment H-8269, ruled not germane. H.J. 896.
2018-05-01HouseMotion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 896.
2018-05-01HouseMotion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of H-8296 to committee amendment H-8269. H.J. 895.
2018-05-01HousePoint of order raised on H-8296 to committee amendment H-8269, ruled not germane. H.J. 895.
2018-04-30HouseAmendments H-8436 and H-8441 filed. H.J. 892.
2018-04-04HouseAmendment H-8362 filed. H.J. 750.
2018-03-26HouseAmendment H-8313 filed. H.J. 679.
2018-03-22HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 671.
2018-03-20HouseAmendments H-8295, H-8296 and H-8300 filed. H.J. 632.
2018-03-19HouseFiscal note.
2018-03-15HouseCommittee amendment H-8269 filed. H.J. 597.
2018-03-15HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 596.
2018-03-14HouseSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2018-03-14HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 03/14/2018 11:00AM RM 19.
2018-03-12HouseSubcommittee: Lundgren, Salmon, Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 576.
2017-03-23HouseRead first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 760.
2017-03-22HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 754.
2017-03-22SenateImmediate message. S.J. 730.
2017-03-27SenateExplanation of vote. S.J. 787.
2017-03-22SenatePassed Senate, ayes 43, nays 6. S.J. 730.
2017-02-27SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 414.
2017-02-27SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 411.

Same As/Similar To

SF52 (Similar To) 2017-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback