IA SF358 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning title to real estate. (Formerly SSB 1220.) Effective 7-1-13.
Title
A bill for an act concerning title to real estate. (Formerly SSB 1220.) Effective 7-1-13.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | House | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-05-01 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 958. |
2013-04-29 | House | Sent to Governor. S.J. 926. |
2013-04-29 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 926. |
2013-04-15 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 838. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 838. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 835. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3142. S.J. 834. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3142. S.J. 805. |
2013-04-09 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 808. |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed House, ayes 99, nays none. H.J. 801. |
2013-04-09 | House | Amendment H-1261 as amended, adopted. H.J. 801. |
2013-04-09 | House | Amendment H-1270 to amendment H-1261 filed, adopted. H.J. 801. |
2013-04-08 | House | Amendment H-1261 filed. H.J. 786. |
2013-04-03 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 750. |
2013-03-27 | House | Subcommittee, Hagenow, Dawson, and Garrett. H.J. 698. |
2013-03-26 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 673. |
2013-03-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 673. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 640. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 639. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Amendment S-3061 filed, adopted. S.J. 639. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 416. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 413. |