IA SF357 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-17 - Subcommittee: Garrett, Bisignano, and Schultz. S.J. 119.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act creating a capital murder offense by establishing the penalty of death for murder in the first degree offenses involving kidnapping and sexual abuse offenses against the same victim who is a minor, providing penalties, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(Formerly SF 14.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act creating a capital murder offense by establishing the penalty of death for murder in the first degree offenses involving kidnapping and sexual abuse offenses against the same victim who is a minor, providing penalties, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(Formerly SF 14.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-17SenateSubcommittee: Garrett, Bisignano, and Schultz. S.J. 119.
2023-06-05SenateReferred to Judiciary. S.J. 1091.
2023-03-16SenateFiscal note.
2023-02-21SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 374.
2023-02-21SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 369.

Same As/Similar To

SF14 (Similar To) 2023-02-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 357. S.J. 374.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback