IA SF355 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2196. S.J. 208.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2196. S.J. 208.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to fees charged to employees by employers for copies of personnel files and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 1024; See SF 2196.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to fees charged to employees by employers for copies of personnel files and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 1024; See SF 2196.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2196. S.J. 208. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2022 2:30PM Room G17. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee: Koelker, Bisignano, and Cournoyer. S.J. 109. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to State Government. S.J. 726. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 339. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 330. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1024 (Related) 2022-01-13 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2022 2:30PM Room G17.
SF2196 (Similar To) 2022-03-23 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 645.
SF2196 (Similar To) 2022-03-23 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 645.