IA SF352 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-15 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-15 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the property tax exemption for forest reservations and fruit-tree reservations and including effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly SF 112.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the property tax exemption for forest reservations and fruit-tree reservations and including effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly SF 112.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources And Environment Report (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/15/2021 12:00PM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sinclair, Bolkcom, and Dawson. S.J. 359. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 343. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 336. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 330. |
Same As/Similar To
SF112 (Similar To) 2021-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 352. S.J. 336.