IA SF352 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to alternative pathways and alternative practitioner preparation programs leading to initial teacher and administrator licenses and endorsements.
Title
A bill for an act relating to alternative pathways and alternative practitioner preparation programs leading to initial teacher and administrator licenses and endorsements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2019 12:00PM RM 315. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Subcommittee: Rozenboom, Quirmbach, and Sweeney. S.J. 406. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. S.J. 376. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF352 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF352.html |