IA SF351 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 549. S.J. 513.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 549. S.J. 513.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to utility service cost disclosures in connection with certain rental properties, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions. (See SF 549.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to utility service cost disclosures in connection with certain rental properties, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions. (See SF 549.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 549. S.J. 513. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Subcommittee: R. Smith, Jochum, and Johnson. S.J. 406. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 376. |
Same As/Similar To
SF549 (Similar To) 2019-04-01 - Subcommittee: Carlson, Williams and Wills. H.J. 707.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF351 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF351.html |