IA SF347 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Fiscal note. SCS.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Fiscal note. SCS.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the regulation of commercial establishments keeping nonagricultural animals, providing for fees and appropriations, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SF 168; see SF 502.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the regulation of commercial establishments keeping nonagricultural animals, providing for fees and appropriations, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SF 168; see SF 502.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Subcommittee, McCoy, Schultz, and Seng. S.J. 541. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 450. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 415. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 409. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SF347 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/86thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF347.html |