IA SF340 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 545. S.J. 506.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act providing for a human trafficking task force and providing information in an annual report to the general assembly.(See SF 545.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act providing for a human trafficking task force and providing information in an annual report to the general assembly.(See SF 545.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-06SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 545. S.J. 506.
2023-03-01SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
2023-02-27SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 03/01/2023 12:00PM Room 315.
2023-02-21SenateSubcommittee: Shipley, Knox, and Rowley. S.J. 372.
2023-02-20SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 359.

Same As/Similar To

SF545 (Similar To) 2023-03-21 - Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 682.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback