IA SF336 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Message from House, with amendment S-3155. S.J. 975.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Message from House, with amendment S-3155. S.J. 975.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to civil protective orders in sexual abuse cases, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SF 237.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to civil protective orders in sexual abuse cases, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SF 237.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3155. S.J. 975. |
2015-05-05 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 983. |
2015-06-03 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1132. |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed House, ayes 98, nays 1. H.J. 978. |
2015-05-05 | House | Amendment H-1249 as amended, adopted. H.J. 978. |
2015-05-05 | House | Amendment H-1304 to amendment H-1249 filed, adopted. H.J. 977. |
2015-05-05 | House | Amendment H-1260 withdrawn. H.J. 977. |
2015-04-29 | House | Amendment H-1260 filed. H.J. 941. |
2015-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1249 filed. H.J. 919. |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 814. |
2015-04-02 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 749. |
2015-03-30 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2015-03-23 | House | Subcommittee, Heartsill, Anderson, and Jones. H.J. 667. |
2015-03-11 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 547. |
2015-03-10 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 536. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 527. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 525. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 403. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 397. |