IA SF333 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-16 - Subcommittee, Quirmbach, Boettger, and Petersen. S.J. 83.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-16 - Subcommittee, Quirmbach, Boettger, and Petersen. S.J. 83.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a civil cause of action for physical injury or emotional distress resulting from an abortion.
Title
A bill for an act establishing a civil cause of action for physical injury or emotional distress resulting from an abortion.
Sponsors
Sen. Joni Ernst [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-16 | Senate | Subcommittee, Quirmbach, Boettger, and Petersen. S.J. 83. |
2013-12-31 | Senate | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Subcommittee, Quirmbach, Boettger, and Petersen. S.J. 386. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 375. |