IA SF332 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act related to the administration of the national guard educational assistance program. (Formerly SF 174.) Effective 7-1-13.
Title
A bill for an act related to the administration of the national guard educational assistance program. (Formerly SF 174.) Effective 7-1-13.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | Senate | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 914. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 895. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 895. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 773. |
2013-04-08 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 783. |
2013-04-08 | House | Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 774. |
2013-03-26 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 686. |
2013-03-14 | House | Subcommittee, Stanerson, Fry, and Mascher. H.J. 564. |
2013-03-13 | House | Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 553. |
2013-03-13 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 544. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 518. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 516. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 379. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 374. |