IA SF331 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Subcommittee, Watts, Highfill, and Stutsman. H.J. 733.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Subcommittee, Watts, Highfill, and Stutsman. H.J. 733.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act permitting electronic voter registration and including penalties and effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1152.)
Title
A bill for an act permitting electronic voter registration and including penalties and effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1152.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Subcommittee, Watts, Highfill, and Stutsman. H.J. 733. |
2015-03-23 | House | Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 665. |
2015-03-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 664. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 662. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 20. S.J. 656. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Amendment S-3057 withdrawn. S.J. 655. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Amendment S-3057 filed. S.J. 651. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 404. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 396. |