IA SF328 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Summary
A bill for an act relating to reimbursement of hazardous substance cleanup costs. (Formerly SF 99.) Effective 7-1-09.
Title
A bill for an act relating to reimbursement of hazardous substance cleanup costs. (Formerly SF 99.) Effective 7-1-09.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-07 | * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * * | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 775. | |
2009-03-17 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 676. | |
2009-03-17 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 676. | |
2009-03-11 | Message from House. S.J. 599. | |
2009-03-10 | Immediate message. H.J. 744. | |
2009-03-10 | Passed House, ayes 96, nays none. H.J. 742. | |
2009-03-10 | Substituted for HF 489. H.J. 742. | |
2009-03-10 | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 731. | |
2009-03-10 | Message from Senate. H.J. 716. | |
2009-03-09 | Immediate message. S.J. 553. | |
2009-03-09 | Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays none. S.J. 548. | |
2009-03-04 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 515. | |
2009-03-04 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 512. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0360B&ga=83 |