IA SF320 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Withdrawn. S.J. 880.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Withdrawn. S.J. 880.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to permissible interest rates and charges for certain loans. (Formerly SSB 1096.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to permissible interest rates and charges for certain loans. (Formerly SSB 1096.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 880. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | HF 260 substituted. S.J. 879. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 857. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 260. S.J. 622. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 363. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 358. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB31 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 213.
SSB1096 (Related) 2019-02-11 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF260 (Similar To) 2019-04-15 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 858.
SSB1096 (Related) 2019-02-11 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF260 (Similar To) 2019-04-15 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 858.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF320 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF320.html |