IA SF32 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 446. S.J. 441.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to required considerations by a county compensation board.(See SF 446.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to required considerations by a county compensation board.(See SF 446.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-28SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 446. S.J. 441.
2023-01-12SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
2023-01-11SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/12/2023 12:00PM Room 315.
2023-01-11SenateSubcommittee: Klimesh, Guth, and Winckler. S.J. 102.
2023-01-10SenateIntroduced, referred to Local Government. S.J. 76.

Same As/Similar To

SF446 (Similar To) 2024-01-11 - Subcommittee: Green, Shipley, and Winckler. S.J. 96.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback