IA SF311 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to wage payment collection issues arising between employers and individuals who provide services to employers, providing penalties and remedies, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 116.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to wage payment collection issues arising between employers and individuals who provide services to employers, providing penalties and remedies, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 116.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-03-09 | Subcommittee, Horbach, L. Miller, and Murphy. H.J. 645. | |
2011-03-09 | Read first time, referred to Labor. H.J. 586. | |
2011-03-08 | Message from Senate. H.J. 565. | |
2011-03-08 | Immediate message. S.J. 538. | |
2011-03-08 | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 23. S.J. 536. | |
2011-02-24 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 401. | |
2011-02-24 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 398. |