IA SF306 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-16 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-16 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act increasing the penalty for motor vehicles that traverse certain railroad grade crossings against a gate or signal.
Title
A bill for an act increasing the penalty for motor vehicles that traverse certain railroad grade crossings against a gate or signal.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Behn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-16 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Zumbach, Bisignano, and Breitbach. S.J. 68. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Anderson, Bisignano, and Zumbach. S.J. 402. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Transportation. S.J. 368. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF306 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF306.html |