IA SF306 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 932.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 932.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to communication and visitation between an adult ward and another person. (Formerly SSB 1162.) Effective 7-1-15.
Title
A bill for an act relating to communication and visitation between an adult ward and another person. (Formerly SSB 1162.) Effective 7-1-15.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 932. |
2015-04-21 | House | Sent to Governor. S.J. 906. |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 906. |
2015-04-09 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 812. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 835. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 833. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3110. S.J. 833. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3110. S.J. 791. |
2015-04-07 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 786. |
2015-04-14 | House | Explanations of votes. H.J. 841. |
2015-04-07 | House | Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 780. |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee amendment H-1157 adopted. H.J. 780. |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee amendment H-1157 filed. H.J. 720. |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 719. |
2015-03-24 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2015-03-17 | House | Subcommittee, Gustafson, Branhagen, and Dawson. H.J. 634. |
2015-03-17 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 619. |
2015-03-17 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 615. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 611. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 610. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3046 filed, adopted. S.J. 609. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 389. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 384. |