IA SF300 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - Subcommittee: Segebart, Guth, and J. Smith. S.J. 380.
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - Subcommittee: Segebart, Guth, and J. Smith. S.J. 380.
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act related to allowable annual salaries for deputy county auditors in charge of elections administration.
Title
A bill for an act related to allowable annual salaries for deputy county auditors in charge of elections administration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee: Segebart, Guth, and J. Smith. S.J. 380. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Local Government. S.J. 338. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB170 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 367.
HF595 (Similar To) 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
HF595 (Similar To) 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF300 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF300.html |