IA SF299 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to environmental protection, including solid waste, sewage works, hazardous waste, infectious medical waste, and pesticide and fertilizer contamination. (Formerly SSB 1046.) Effective 7-1-11.
Title
A bill for an act relating to environmental protection, including solid waste, sewage works, hazardous waste, infectious medical waste, and pesticide and fertilizer contamination. (Formerly SSB 1046.) Effective 7-1-11.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-03-30 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 846. | |
2011-03-28 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 815. | |
2011-03-28 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 815. | |
2011-03-24 | Message from House. S.J. 792. | |
2011-03-23 | Immediate message. H.J. 795. | |
2011-03-23 | Passed House, ayes 94, nays none. H.J. 790. | |
2011-03-23 | Substituted for HF 514. H.J. 790. | |
2011-03-08 | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 560. | |
2011-03-07 | Message from Senate. H.J. 541. | |
2011-03-07 | Immediate message. S.J. 491. | |
2011-03-07 | Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays 4. S.J. 491. | |
2011-03-07 | Amendment S-3042 adopted. S.J. 490. | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment S-3042 filed. S.J. 484. | |
2011-02-24 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 401. | |
2011-02-24 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 395. |