IA SF290 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to asbestos regulations administered by the division of labor services of the department of workforce development. (Formerly SSB 1037.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to asbestos regulations administered by the division of labor services of the department of workforce development. (Formerly SSB 1037.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-12-31 END OF 2011 ACTIONS
2011-03-21 Subcommittee reassigned, Moore, Deyoe, and Kearns. H.J. 740.
2011-03-09 Subcommittee, Brandenburg, Deyoe, and Kearns. H.J. 645.
2011-03-08 Read first time, referred to Labor. H.J. 561.
2011-03-07 Message from Senate. H.J. 551.
2011-03-07 Immediate message. S.J. 501.
2011-03-07 Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 24. S.J. 496.
2011-02-23 Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 390.
2011-02-23 Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 385.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback