IA SF290 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *

Summary

A bill for an act creating a disaster aid local government assistance grant program and fund. (Formerly SSB 1221.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act creating a disaster aid local government assistance grant program and fund. (Formerly SSB 1221.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-07 * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
2009-03-10 Subcommittee, Appel, Feenstra, and Hogg. S.J. 594.
2009-03-09 Referred to Appropriations. S.J. 547.
2009-03-02 Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 490.
2009-03-02 Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 481.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback