IA SF273 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 502. S.J. 475.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 502. S.J. 475.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the railroad revolving loan and grant fund by making moneys available to certain railroads operating exclusively in Iowa.(See SF 502, SF 2112.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the railroad revolving loan and grant fund by making moneys available to certain railroads operating exclusively in Iowa.(See SF 502, SF 2112.)
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Shipley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-02 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 502. S.J. 475. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2023 10:30AM Room 315. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Shipley, T. Taylor, and Webster. S.J. 342. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Transportation. S.J. 314. |
Same As/Similar To
SF502 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2112. S.J. 153.
SF2112 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
SF2112 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF273 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF273.html |