IA SF273 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-03 - Withdrawn. S.J. 852.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-03 - Withdrawn. S.J. 852.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the solid waste environmental management systems program and beautification grants. (Formerly SSB 1027.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the solid waste environmental management systems program and beautification grants. (Formerly SSB 1027.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 852. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 838. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 353. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 347. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB16 (Related) 2017-01-31 - Passed subcommittee.
SSB1027 (Related) 2017-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF202 (Similar To) 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1007.
SSB1027 (Related) 2017-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF202 (Similar To) 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1007.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF273 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF273.html |