IA SF273 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-11 - Subcommittee, L. Miller, R. Taylor, and Winckler. H.J. 549.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act establishing an interstate medical licensure compact. (Formerly SSB 1019.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act establishing an interstate medical licensure compact. (Formerly SSB 1019.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-11HouseSubcommittee, L. Miller, R. Taylor, and Winckler. H.J. 549.
2015-03-10HouseRead first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 503.
2015-03-09HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 498.
2015-03-09SenateImmediate message. S.J. 473.
2015-03-09SenatePassed Senate, ayes 42, nays 7. S.J. 471.
2015-02-19SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 336.
2015-02-19SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 332.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback