IA SF270 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-26 - Subcommittee, Forristall, Hunter, and Watts. H.J. 429.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-26 - Subcommittee, Forristall, Hunter, and Watts. H.J. 429.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to wage payment collection issues arising between employers and individuals who provide services to employers, providing penalties and remedies, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 39.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to wage payment collection issues arising between employers and individuals who provide services to employers, providing penalties and remedies, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 39.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-26 | House | Subcommittee, Forristall, Hunter, and Watts. H.J. 429. |
2015-02-24 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2015-02-26 | House | Read first time, referred to Labor. H.J. 424. |
2015-02-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 408. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 356. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 23. S.J. 356. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 328. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 323. |