IA SF268 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Withdrawn. S.J. 936.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Withdrawn. S.J. 936.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act increasing the required amount for a surety bond necessary for the issuance of a travel trailer dealer's license, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1072.)
Title
A bill for an act increasing the required amount for a surety bond necessary for the issuance of a travel trailer dealer's license, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1072.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 936. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | HF 391 substituted. S.J. 935. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 391. S.J. 911. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 857. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 313. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 307. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB13 (Related) 2019-02-13 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 291.
SSB1072 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF391 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1080.
SSB1072 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF391 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1080.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF268 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF268.html |