IA SF265 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1194.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1194.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the sale of certain mushrooms at farmers markets, and providing an effective date. (Formerly SSB 1111.) Effective 5-3-19.
Title
A bill for an act providing for the sale of certain mushrooms at farmers markets, and providing an effective date. (Formerly SSB 1111.) Effective 5-3-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1194. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1193. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 983. |
2019-04-16 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 883. |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed House, yeas 99 nays none. H.J. 867. |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 843. |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 653. |
2019-03-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-03-19 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/20/2019 9:00AM House Lounge. |
2019-03-12 | House | Subcommittee: Gerhold, Baxter and Bearinger. H.J. 524. |
2019-02-21 | House | Read first time, referred to Agriculture. H.J. 340. |
2019-02-21 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 335. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 356. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 393. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 355. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Amendment S-3006 out of order. S.J. 355. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Amendment S-3009 filed, adopted. S.J. 355. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Amendment S-3006 filed. S.J. 347. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 312. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 307. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1111 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.