IA SF259 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act allowing the operation of certain motorboats on lake Macbride at any time. (Formerly SF 126.)
Title
A bill for an act allowing the operation of certain motorboats on lake Macbride at any time. (Formerly SF 126.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. |
2018-01-16 | House | Subcommittee: Wills, Ourth and Zumbach. H.J. 105. |
2017-03-03 | House | Read first time, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 509. |
2017-03-02 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 500. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 437. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 38, nays 12. S.J. 437. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 303. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 298. |
Same As/Similar To
SF126 (Similar To) 2017-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.