IA SF253 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-27 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the protection of life beginning at conception, and including effective date provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the protection of life beginning at conception, and including effective date provisions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-27SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2017-02-23SenateSubcommittee reassigned: Schultz, Petersen, and Zaun. S.J. 402.
2017-02-20SenateSubcommittee: Sinclair, Petersen, and Schultz. S.J. 359.
2017-02-14SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 281.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback