IA SF245 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 386. S.J. 393.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 386. S.J. 393.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to compensation of college athletes and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See SF 386.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to compensation of college athletes and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See SF 386.)
Sponsors
Sen. Nate Boulton [D] | Sen. Brad Zaun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 386. S.J. 393. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/10/2021 2:00PM RM 24A. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zaun, Boulton, and Johnson. S.J. 299. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 248. |
Same As/Similar To
SF386 (Similar To) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 726.
HF671 (Similar To) 2021-02-23 - Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 506.
HF671 (Similar To) 2021-02-23 - Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 506.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF245 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF245.html |