IA SF2416 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - NOBA: Graybook
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations and related statutory changes involving certain state departments, agencies, funds, and certain other entities, providing for regulatory authority, and other properly related matters, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3219.) Various effective dates; see section 27 of bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations and related statutory changes involving certain state departments, agencies, funds, and certain other entities, providing for regulatory authority, and other properly related matters, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3219.) Various effective dates; see section 27 of bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 55 N: 38 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01HouseNOBA: Graybook
2018-06-01HouseSigned by Governor. S.J. 1088.
2018-05-05HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1086.
2018-05-04HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 967.
2018-05-04SenateImmediate message. S.J. 1058.
2018-05-05SenateExplanation of vote. S.J. 1078.
2018-05-04SenateNOBA: Final
2018-05-04SenatePassed Senate, ayes 28, nays 20. S.J. 1058.
2018-05-04SenateSenate concurred with S-5300. S.J. 1057.
2018-05-04SenateAmendment S-5307 to S-5300 filed, lost. S.J. 1057.
2018-05-02SenateNOBA: House Floor
2018-05-04SenateDeferred. S.J. 1050.
2018-05-02SenateNOBA: Senate Floor
2018-05-02SenateMessage from House, with amendment S-5300. S.J. 1032.
2018-05-02HouseImmediate message. H.J. 924.
2018-05-02HousePassed House, ayes 55, nays 38. H.J. 922.
2018-05-02HouseAmendment H-8464 adopted. H.J. 922.
2018-05-02HouseAmendment H-8464 filed. H.J. 921.
2018-05-02HouseSubstituted for HF 2499. H.J. 921.
2018-05-02HouseRead first time, passed on file. H.J. 916.
2018-05-02HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 916.
2018-05-02SenateImmediate message. S.J. 1020.
2018-05-02SenatePassed Senate, ayes 28, nays 20. S.J. 1019.
2018-05-02SenatePoint of order raised on S-5282, ruled out of order. S.J. 1019.
2018-05-02SenateAmendment S-5278 withdrawn. S.J. 1019.
2018-05-02SenateAmendment S-5289 adopted. S.J. 1019.
2018-05-02SenateAmendments S-5283 and S-5279 withdrawn. S.J. 1018.
2018-05-02SenateAmendment S-5276 adopted. S.J. 1018.
2018-05-01SenateAmendments S-5278, S-5279, S-5282, S-5283 to S-5279, and S-5289 filed. S.J. 1015.
2018-04-30SenateAmendment S-5276 filed. S.J. 1001.
2018-04-27SenateNOBA: Senate Full Approps
2018-04-26SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 986.
2018-04-26SenateIntroduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 983.

Same As/Similar To

SSB3219 (Related) 2018-04-26 - NOBA: Senate Sub
HSB699 (Related) 2018-05-01 - NOBA: House Sub
HF2499 (Similar To) 2018-05-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 928.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback