IA SF2415 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-16 - Subcommittee: Best, Isenhart and Johnson. H.J. 816.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-16 - Subcommittee: Best, Isenhart and Johnson. H.J. 816.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicle special registration plate decals created by a nonprofit veterans' organization or associated with military service.(Formerly SF 564, SF 224, SF 90.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicle special registration plate decals created by a nonprofit veterans' organization or associated with military service.(Formerly SF 564, SF 224, SF 90.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Subcommittee: Best, Isenhart and Johnson. H.J. 816. |
2024-04-10 | House | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 771. |
2024-04-10 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 763. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 792. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 44, nays 0. S.J. 792. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 615. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 613. |
Same As/Similar To
SF90 (Similar To) 2023-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 224. S.J. 278.
SF224 (Similar To) 2023-04-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 564. S.J. 743.
SF564 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2415. S.J. 615.
SF224 (Similar To) 2023-04-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 564. S.J. 743.
SF564 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2415. S.J. 615.