IA SF2414 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - NOBA: Graybook
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to state departments and agencies from the rebuild Iowa infrastructure fund and the technology reinvestment fund, providing for related matters, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3218.) Various effective dates; see section 13 of bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to state departments and agencies from the rebuild Iowa infrastructure fund and the technology reinvestment fund, providing for related matters, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3218.) Various effective dates; see section 13 of bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 57 N: 36 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01SenateNOBA: Graybook
2018-06-01SenateSigned by Governor. S.J. 1088.
2018-05-03SenateNOBA: Senate Floor
2018-05-05SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1086.
2018-05-02SenateNOBA: Final
2018-05-02SenateMessage from House. S.J. 1031.
2018-05-02HouseImmediate message. H.J. 927.
2018-05-02HousePassed House, ayes 57, nays 36. H.J. 927.
2018-05-02HouseSubstituted for HF 2497. H.J. 926.
2018-05-02HouseRead first time, passed on file. H.J. 923.
2018-05-02HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 923.
2018-05-02SenateImmediate message. S.J. 1022.
2018-05-02SenatePassed Senate, ayes 45, nays 3. S.J. 1021.
2018-05-02SenateAmendment S-5296 adopted. S.J. 1021.
2018-05-02SenateAmendment S-5291 out of order. S.J. 1021.
2018-05-02SenateAmendment S-5297 to S-5296 filed, lost. S.J. 1021.
2018-05-02SenateAmendment S-5298 to S-5296 filed, lost. S.J. 1021.
2018-05-02SenateAmendments S-5291 and S-5296 filed. S.J. 1021.
2018-04-26SenateNOBA: Senate Full Approps
2018-04-26SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 985.
2018-04-26SenateIntroduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 982.

Same As/Similar To

SSB3218 (Related) 2018-04-26 - NOBA: Senate Sub
HSB697 (Related) 2018-04-30 - NOBA: House Sub
HF2497 (Similar To) 2018-05-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 928.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback