IA SF2403 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-17 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-17 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the excise taxes on motor fuel and certain special fuel, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 628, SSB 1246.) Effective date: 07/01/2020. Applicability date: 01/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the excise taxes on motor fuel and certain special fuel, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 628, SSB 1246.) Effective date: 07/01/2020. Applicability date: 01/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-03 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 864. |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 862. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 664. |
2020-06-03 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 625. |
2020-06-03 | House | Passed House, yeas 97, nays none. H.J. 621. |
2020-06-03 | House | Substituted for HF 2279. H.J. 620. |
2020-06-03 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 611. |
2020-06-03 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 611. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 639. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 636. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 533. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways & Means calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 530. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1246 (Related) 2019-04-02 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF628 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2403. S.J. 533.
SF628 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2403. S.J. 533.