IA SF2401 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 929.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 929.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act regulating the marketing of grain, by providing for fees paid by grain dealers and warehouse operators into the grain depositors and sellers indemnity fund, and the payment of claims to reimburse sellers and depositors for losses covered by the fund, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 2393, SSB 3174.)
Title
A bill for an act regulating the marketing of grain, by providing for fees paid by grain dealers and warehouse operators into the grain depositors and sellers indemnity fund, and the payment of claims to reimburse sellers and depositors for losses covered by the fund, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 2393, SSB 3174.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 929. |
2024-04-18 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 929. |
2024-04-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2024-04-16 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/17/2024 11:00AM House Lounge. |
2024-04-16 | House | Subcommittee: Deyoe, Kurth and Wulf. H.J. 816. |
2024-04-15 | House | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 792. |
2024-04-03 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 717. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 726. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 724. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Amendment S-5113 adopted. S.J. 723. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Amendment S-5113 filed. S.J. 701. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 424. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 423. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3174 (Related) 2024-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2393.
SF2393 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2401. S.J. 424.
SF2393 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2401. S.J. 424.