IA SF2394 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to surcharges added to criminal penalties, court funds, civil fees, misdemeanor and felony fines and fines associated with scheduled violations. (Formerly SSB 3202.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to surcharges added to criminal penalties, court funds, civil fees, misdemeanor and felony fines and fines associated with scheduled violations. (Formerly SSB 3202.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-04-10 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/11/2018 8:30AM House Lounge. |
2018-04-10 | House | Subcommittee: Rizer, Mohr, G. and Wolfe. H.J. 769. |
2018-04-09 | House | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 756. |
2018-04-05 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 751. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Fiscal note, revised. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 879. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 45, nays 4. S.J. 879. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5223 filed, adopted. S.J. 878. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5224 filed, adopted. S.J. 878. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5219 adopted. S.J. 877. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5225 to S-5219 filed, lost. S.J. 877. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 867. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5219 filed. S.J. 867. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 821. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chelgren, Boulton, and Shipley. S.J. 772. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations. S.J. 757. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 754. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 754. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3202 (Related) 2018-03-15 - Subcommittee recommends passage.