IA SF2390 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1087.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1087.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to licensure and regulation for the hotel sanitation code, home bakeries, and food establishments and food processing plants, modifying fees and penalties, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1169.) Effective 1-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to licensure and regulation for the hotel sanitation code, home bakeries, and food establishments and food processing plants, modifying fees and penalties, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1169.) Effective 1-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1087. |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1086. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1044. |
2018-05-03 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 949. |
2018-05-04 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 971. |
2018-05-03 | House | Passed House, ayes 86, nays 4. H.J. 934. |
2018-05-03 | House | Motion to suspend rules prevailed. H.J. 932. |
2018-05-03 | House | Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration. H.J. 932. |
2018-05-02 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 928. |
2018-05-02 | House | Fiscal note. |
2018-05-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-05-01 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 05/02/2018 8:30AM House Lounge. |
2018-05-01 | House | Subcommittee: Baltimore, Bergan and Gaskill. H.J. 902. |
2018-04-26 | House | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 839. |
2018-04-26 | House | Fiscal note. |
2018-04-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 826. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 972. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 1014. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 42, nays 3. S.J. 970. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Amendment S-5253 out of order. S.J. 970. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Amendment S-5255 adopted. S.J. 970. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Amendments S-5253 and S-5255 filed. S.J. 970. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 696. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 694. |
Same As/Similar To
SF303 (Similar To) 2017-02-22 - Subcommittee: Feenstra, Brown, and Jochum. S.J. 387.
SSB1169 (Related) 2018-03-06 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SSB1169 (Related) 2018-03-06 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.