IA SF2379 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1075.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1075.
Summary
A bill for an act relating to permits to carry weapons and permits to acquire pistols and revolvers including the dissemination of information relating to persons suffering from mental and substance abuse health-related disorders and the possession of firearms and providing penalties and an effective date. Effective 1-1-11.
Title
A bill for an act relating to permits to carry weapons and permits to acquire pistols and revolvers including the dissemination of information relating to persons suffering from mental and substance abuse health-related disorders and the possession of firearms and providing penalties and an effective date. Effective 1-1-11.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1075. | |
2010-03-30 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1070. | |
2010-03-30 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1070. | |
2010-03-29 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1475. | |
2010-03-29 | Immediate message. S.J. 1055. | |
2010-03-29 | Passed Senate, ayes 38, nays 4. S.J. 1055. | |
2010-03-29 | Senate concurred with S-5397. S.J. 1055. | |
2010-03-29 | Message from House, with amendment S-5397. S.J. 1054. | |
2010-03-29 | Immediate message. H.J. 1404. | |
2010-03-30 | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1559. | |
2010-03-29 | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1477. | |
2010-03-29 | Passed House, ayes 81, nays 16. H.J. 1403. | |
2010-03-29 | Amendment H-8659 lost. H.J. 1403. | |
2010-03-29 | Amendment H-8659 filed. H.J. 1402. | |
2010-03-29 | Amendment H-8653 filed, adopted. H.J. 1402. | |
2010-03-29 | Amendment H-8652 lost. H.J. 1402. | |
2010-03-29 | Substituted for HF 2528. H.J. 1395. | |
2010-03-27 | Amendment H-8652 filed. H.J. 1386. | |
2010-03-27 | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 1382. | |
2010-03-27 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1381. | |
2010-03-27 | Immediate message. S.J. 1042. | |
2010-03-27 | Passed Senate, ayes 44, nays 4. S.J. 1041. | |
2010-03-27 | Amendment S-5370 adopted as amended. S.J. 1041. | |
2010-03-27 | Amendments S-5372, S-5373, and S-5374 withdrawn. S.J. 1040. | |
2010-03-27 | Amendment S-5387 adopted. S.J. 1040. | |
2010-03-27 | Amendment S-5371 lost. S.J. 1039. | |
2010-03-26 | Amendment S-5387 filed. S.J. 1037. | |
2010-03-26 | Amendments S-5370, S-5371, S-5372, S-5373, and S-5374 filed. S.J. 1036. | |
2010-03-26 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 1033. | |
2010-03-16 | Subcommittee, Kreiman, Kettering, and Schoenjahn. S.J. 862. | |
2010-03-16 | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 861. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0947B&ga=83 |